Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/29/2015 at 00:22:59 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. ONE 1995 CHEVROLET TAHOE VIN:1GNEC13K5S

Case Summary

On 01/03/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against ONE 1995 CHEVROLET TAHOE VIN 1GNEC13K5S. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0280

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

ONE 1995 CHEVROLET TAHOE VIN:1GNEC13K5SJ445757

BURCIAGA, JAIME MARTIN

BURCIAGA, HORTENCIA N

OGDEN, FRANKIE

FIRST STATE BANK OF UVALDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS, KAREN L.

Defendant Attorneys

JOHNSON, HENRY WILLIAM

KESSLER, WILLIAM A. JR.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2003
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY) (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2003
  • MULTIPLE PARTIES OR EXCEPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2003
  • STENO FEE ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2003
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2003
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2003
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2003
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JOHNSON, HENRY WILLIAM Person Filing - BURCIAGA, HORTENCIA N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JOHNSON, HENRY WILLIAM Person Filing - BURCIAGA, JAIME MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2003
  • DISCLAIMER : Filing Attorney - KESSLER, WILLIAM A. JR. Person Filing - FIRST STATE BANK OF UVALDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KESSLER, WILLIAM A. JR. Person Filing - FIRST STATE BANK OF UVALDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less