Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/11/2015 at 09:19:02 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. ONE 1989 BUICK LESABRE VIN 1G4HR54C5KH53

Case Summary

On 12/12/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against ONE 1989 BUICK LESABRE VIN 1G4HR54C5KH53. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7563

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

ONE 1989 BUICK LESABRE VIN 1G4HR54C5KH539952

VALADEZ, JOHNNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Defendant Attorney

LINDEMAN, JAMES E III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY) (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • STENO FEE ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2004
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2004
  • NEW TRIAL GRANTED CASE REINSTATED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2004
  • MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2004
  • MOTION NEW TRIAL : Filing Attorney - LINDEMAN, JAMES E III Person Filing - VALADEZ, JOHNNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2004
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2004
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LINDEMAN, JAMES E III Person Filing - VALADEZ, JOHNNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less