Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/28/2015 at 11:44:32 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. APPROXIMATELY $8,750.00

Case Summary

On 03/07/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against APPROXIMATELY 8,750 00. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2184

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

APPROXIMATELY $8,750.00

EDWARDS, VINCENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Defendant Attorney

OSSO, ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2004
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2004
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2003
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2003
  • ORDER LIFTING STAY SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ENTRY OF TEMPORARY ORDERS (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2003
  • REMOVED FROM ABATEMENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2003
  • CASE ABATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2003
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OSSO, ANTHONY Person Filing - EDWARDS, VINCENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less