Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/25/2015 at 15:45:08 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. APPROXIMATELY $7,782.11

Case Summary

On 06/11/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against APPROXIMATELY 7,782 11. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2533

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

STATE OF TEXAS

BROUSSARD, HAZEL R

APPROXIMATELY $7,782.11

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

MCANELLY, ROBERT V.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2004
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2004
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2004
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2004
  • SETTLEMENT ANNOUNCED NOT ON RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PRODUCTION (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2004
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2004
  • REMOVED FROM ABATEMENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2004
  • ORDER LIFTING STAY SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2003
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2003
  • CASE ABATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2003
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - MCANELLY, ROBERT V. Person Filing - BROUSSARD, HAZEL R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2003
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCANELLY, ROBERT V. Person Filing - BROUSSARD, HAZEL R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less