Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/29/2015 at 18:22:18 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. APPROXIMATELY $495,959.52

Case Summary

On 07/18/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against APPROXIMATELY 495,959 52. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0194

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

APPROXIMATELY $495,959.52

DANIELS, JACKIE (AKA JUCQUELINE DANIELS PERSONALLY AND DBA QUICK CASH

DANIELS, JACQUELINE

QUICK CASH INC

QUICK CASH

PICKUP CASH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2006
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2005
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2005
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2005
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2004
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2003
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2003
  • CASE ABATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less