Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/26/2015 at 13:12:03 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. APPROXIMATELY $47,880.00

Case Summary

On 04/07/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against APPROXIMATELY 47,880 00. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8317

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

APPROXIMATELY $47,880.00

CARRET, PEDRO RIVERO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS, KAREN L.

Defendant Attorney

BRUMAN, STEVEN I.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2003
  • ATTORNEY AD LITEM FEE AWARDED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY) (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • STENO FEE ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BRUMAN, STEVEN I. Person Filing - APPROXIMATELY $47,880.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2003
  • ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2003
  • MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2003
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less