Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/11/2015 at 01:03:18 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. APPROXIMATELY $346,700.58

Case Summary

On 01/16/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against APPROXIMATELY 346,700 58. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2360

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

APPROXIMATELY $346,700.58

ASIAN MONEY TRANSFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Defendant Attorney

YOUNG, CHARLES (RICK)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2003
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2003
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED DENYING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED DENYING LEAVE TO FILE 3RD PARTY ACTION (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED DENYING SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED DENYING RECUSAL OF JUDGE (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2003
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2003
  • MOTION TO RECUSE JUDGE DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED STRIKING VISITING JUDGE (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2003
  • VISITING JUDGE STRUCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2003
  • SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS : Filing Attorney - YOUNG, CHARLES (RICK) Person Filing - ASIAN MONEY TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2003
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - YOUNG, CHARLES (RICK) Person Filing - ASIAN MONEY TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2003
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - YOUNG, CHARLES (RICK) Person Filing - ASIAN MONEY TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less