Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/05/2015 at 16:51:14 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. APPROXIMATELY $2,785.00

Case Summary

On 05/22/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against APPROXIMATELY 2,785 00. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7343

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

APPROXIMATELY $2,785.00

BAEZA, PASCUAL (AKA PASCUAL BAEZA-BADILLO)

BAEZA-BADILLO, PASCUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Defendant Attorney

KELLEY, PATRICK MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2004
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY) (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2004
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2004
  • STENO FEE ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2004
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2004
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2004
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2004
  • REMOVED FROM ABATEMENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2004
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2004
  • ORDER LIFTING STAY SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2003
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2003
  • CASE ABATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2003
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KELLEY, PATRICK MICHAEL Person Filing - BAEZA, PASCUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less