Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/05/2015 at 15:29:19 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. APPROXIMATELY $1,791.68

Case Summary

On 05/22/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against APPROXIMATELY 1,791 68. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6799

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

STATE OF TEXAS

AKINS, VIVIAN ANN

APPROXIMATELY $1,791.68

AKINS, JAKE JUSTIN-WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

WILLIAMS, QUENTIN TATE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2004
  • JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC SIGNED (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2004
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2004
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2003
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2003
  • MOTION FOR DOCKET CONTROL/PRE TRIAL ORDER GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED STRIKING VISITING JUDGE (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2003
  • VISITING JUDGE STRUCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2003
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILLIAMS, QUENTIN TATE Person Filing - AKINS, JAKE JUSTIN-WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2003
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - WILLIAMS, QUENTIN TATE Person Filing - AKINS, VIVIAN ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILLIAMS, QUENTIN TATE Person Filing - AKINS, JAKE JUSTIN-WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less