Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/02/2015 at 00:04:43 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. APPROXIMATELY $15,838.10

Case Summary

On 01/07/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against APPROXIMATELY 15,838 10. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0492

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

APPROXIMATELY $15,838.10

ONE 1994 FREIGHTLINER TRUCK (VIN 1FUYDZYB2RH428371)

ONE 1974 WILCO TANKER TRAILER (VIN AT129-74)

ONE 2002 FORD EXCURSION (VIN 1FMSU43F12EA53490)

WEST, LARRY FLYNN SR

CHAVEZ, JEANNIE R

EAST HOUSTON USED OIL

ASSOCIATES COMERCIAL CORP

WEST, VIRGINIA

SULLIVAN, CAROLINE

FORD MOTOR CREDIT CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Defendant Attorney

CARROLL, J. C. JR.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2006
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY) (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2006
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2006
  • INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2006
  • STENO FEE ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2006
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2006
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2006
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2005
  • REMOVED FROM ABATEMENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2003
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CARROLL, J. C. JR. Person Filing - EAST HOUSTON USED OIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CARROLL, J. C. JR. Person Filing - CHAVEZ, JEANNIE R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CARROLL, J. C. JR. Person Filing - WEST, LARRY F JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CARROLL, J. C. JR. Person Filing - WEST, VIRGINIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CARROLL, J. C. JR. Person Filing - SULLIVAN, CAROLINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2003
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CARROLL, J. C. JR. Person Filing - WEST, LARRY FLYNN SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant