Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/02/2015 at 12:52:55 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. APPROXIMATELY $140,380.00

Case Summary

On 03/14/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against APPROXIMATELY 140,380 00. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3540

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

APPROXIMATELY $140,380.00

DIAZ, LUIS ORLANDO (AKA CESAR MORENO CALIMENO)

CALIMENO, CESAR MORENO (AKA LUIS ORLANDO DIAZ)

PENA, HUGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Defendant Attorney

MULDROW, LORETTA JOHNSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2004
  • ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2004
  • ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2004
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY) (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2004
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2004
  • STENO FEE ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2004
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2004
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2004
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2003
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2003
  • MOTION FOR DOCKET CONTROL/PRE TRIAL ORDER GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2003
  • ANSWER ATTORNEY AD LITEM : Filing Attorney - MULDROW, LORETTA JOHNSON Person Filing - DIAZ, LUIS ORLANDO (AKA CESAR MORENO CALIMENO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2003
  • ANSWER ATTORNEY AD LITEM : Filing Attorney - MULDROW, LORETTA JOHNSON Person Filing - CALIMENO, CESAR MORENO (AKA LUIS ORLANDO DIAZ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2003
  • ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2003
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less