Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/25/2015 at 15:44:53 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS vs. APPROXIMATELY $1,109.00

Case Summary

On 06/11/2003 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against APPROXIMATELY 1,109 00. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2532

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

APPROXIMATELY $1,109.00

ONFRE, EDUARDO C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2004
  • ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • ATTORNEY AD LITEM FEE AWARDED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY) (Final Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • STENO FEE ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2003
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2003
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2003
  • ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2003
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED (Temporary Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2003
  • MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2003
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MORRIS, KAREN L. Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less