This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:11:03 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS (AT THE REQUEST AND ON BE vs. BERGERON, FRANK J

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 STATE OF TEXAS AT THE REQUEST AND ON BE filed an Other lawsuit against BERGERON, FRANK J. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8471

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE OF TEXAS (AT THE REQUEST AND ON BEHALF OF THE TEXAS WORKFORCE

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS (AT THE REQUEST AND ON BEHALF OF THE TEXAS

Defendant

BERGERON, FRANK J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY GENERAL-TEXAS

SMITH, SETH ORMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2005
  • COST STATEMENT REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2005
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING DEPOSITION APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, SETH ORMAN Person Filing - ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS (AT THE REQUEST AND ON BEHALF OF THE TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, SETH ORMAN Person Filing - STATE OF TEXAS (AT THE REQUEST AND ON BEHALF OF THE TEXAS WORKFORCE

    Read MoreRead Less