Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/18/2020 at 07:44:23 (UTC).

STATE BANK EVENTS LLC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE BANK EVENTS LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DEDRA DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5873

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DEDRA DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EAST END WAREHOUSES LLC

STATE BANK EVENTS LLC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT (A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUSAVIDIN, MEHDI

 

Court Documents

Citation - Harris County Appraisal District

12/04/2020: Citation - Harris County Appraisal District

EXHIBIT B

11/24/2020: EXHIBIT B

EXHIBIT A

11/24/2020: EXHIBIT A

PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

11/24/2020: PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT (A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE; Issued: 11/25/2020; Served: 12/4/2020; Tracking: 73814991; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MOUSAVIDIN, MEHDI; Person Filing: EAST END WAREHOUSES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MOUSAVIDIN, MEHDI; Person Filing: STATE BANK EVENTS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mousavidin, Mehdi