This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:07:53 (UTC).

STANLEY, JOSEPH vs. CENTRAL BANK OF HOUSTON

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 STANLEY, JOSEPH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CENTRAL BANK OF HOUSTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7548

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANLEY, JOSEPH

Defendant

CENTRAL BANK OF HOUSTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BILLINGS, FRANK E.

Defendant Attorney

DENUM, CRAIG RANDALL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2005
  • FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2005
  • PLAINTIFF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2005
  • ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED DENYING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS HEARD, NO RULING MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DENUM, CRAIG RANDALL Person Filing - CENTRAL BANK OF HOUSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2004
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2004
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DENUM, CRAIG RANDALL Person Filing - CENTRAL BANK OF HOUSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BILLINGS, FRANK E. Person Filing - STANLEY, JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less