This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:28:19 (UTC).

STALLINGS, DENNIS K vs. STALLINGS, ANN P

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 STALLINGS, DENNIS K filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STALLINGS, ANN P. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1037

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

STALLINGS, DENNIS K

STALLINGS, ANN P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

ALLSHOUSE, J. D. BUCKY

WICOFF, PATRICIA A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • ORDER SGND GRNTG QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING AGREEMENT PER RULE 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - WICOFF, PATRICIA A. Person Filing - STALLINGS, ANN P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2005
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WICOFF, PATRICIA A. Person Filing - STALLINGS, ANN P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ALLSHOUSE, J. D. BUCKY Person Filing - STALLINGS, DENNIS K

    Read MoreRead Less