This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/14/2021 at 07:29:23 (UTC).

ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0624

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT BY SERVNG ITS CHIEF APPRAISER ROLAND

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

09/20/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation

10/01/2021: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT BY SERVNG ITS CHIEF APPRAISER ROLAND; Issued: 9/20/2021; Served: 9/28/2021; Tracking: 73918145; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE; Person Filing: ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE