This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/20/2022 at 07:20:36 (UTC).

SPRING INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. CASTILLO, MARIA C

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 SPRING INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CASTILLO, MARIA C. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4865

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRING INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

CASTILLO, MARIA C

Houston, TX 77070

FGMS HOLDINGS LLC (IN REM ONLY)

ING CAPITAL LLC (IN REM ONLY)

WHITE, JAMES (IN REM ONLY)

Houston, TX 77026

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORPORATION (IN REM ONLY)

Others

FGMS HOLDINGS LLC (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT CREEL

1114 Lost Creek Boulevard Suite 100

Austin, TX 78746

ING CAPITAL LLC (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT UNITED

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORPORATION (IN REM ONLY) BY SREVING ITS

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARLOW, JUSTIN

Defendant Attorney

DITTLINGER, STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

04/26/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

04/26/2022: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

04/26/2022: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

04/26/2022: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

04/26/2022: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

04/26/2022: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

05/13/2022: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Defendant's Original Answer

05/11/2022: Defendant's Original Answer

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

05/10/2022: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

05/05/2022: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

05/03/2022: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DITTLINGER, STEPHEN; Person Filing: FGMS HOLDINGS LLC (IN REM ONLY);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORPORATION (IN REM ONLY) BY SREVING ITS; Issued: 4/26/2022; Served: 5/5/2022; Tracking: 73999241; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WHITE, JAMES (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 4/26/2022; Returned: 4/28/2022; Tracking: 73999240; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ING CAPITAL LLC (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT UNITED; Issued: 4/26/2022; Tracking: 73999239; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FGMS HOLDINGS LLC (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT CREEL; Issued: 4/26/2022; Served: 5/9/2022; Tracking: 73999237; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CASTILLO, MARIA C; Issued: 4/26/2022; Served: 5/3/2022; Returned: 5/3/2022; Tracking: 73999235; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BARLOW, JUSTIN; Person Filing: SPRING INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ING CAPITAL, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SPRING INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where Main Street Acquisition Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where FGMS HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant