This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:42:54 (UTC).

SPRING CENTER INC (AS THE PROPERTY OWNER vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 SPRING CENTER INC AS THE PROPERTY OWNER filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7391

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

SPRING CENTER INC (AS THE PROPERTY OWNERS)

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

PROPERTY OWNERS

APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD OF HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MCKENNEY, HUGH L.

MCCONNELL, ROBERT PATRICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - MCCONNELL, ROBERT PATRICK Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - MCCONNELL, ROBERT PATRICK Person Filing - APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD OF HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2004
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2004
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCCONNELL, ROBERT PATRICK Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - PROPERTY OWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - SPRING CENTER INC (AS THE PROPERTY OWNERS)

    Read MoreRead Less