This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/04/2021 at 02:46:20 (UTC).

SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. DIRECTV LLC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2016 SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against DIRECTV LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2375

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUNKER HILL VILLAGE

CITY OF SPRING VALLEY

SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendant

DIRECTV LLC

Other

DIRECTV LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT C T CORPORATION SYSTEM

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SONIK, OWEN M.

Defendant Attorney

CHASTAIN, TIMOTHY PATRICK

 

Court Documents

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

01/14/2016: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

01/14/2016: PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

Original Intervention

02/09/2016: Original Intervention

DEFENDANT DIRECTV, LLCS ORIGINAL ANSWER TO ORIGINAL INTERVENTION

03/03/2016: DEFENDANT DIRECTV, LLCS ORIGINAL ANSWER TO ORIGINAL INTERVENTION

DEFENDANT DIRECTV, LLC'S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO ORIGINAL PETITION

03/03/2016: DEFENDANT DIRECTV, LLC'S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

03/18/2016: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

12/09/2016: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

Intervenors Notice of Dismissal

12/09/2016: Intervenors Notice of Dismissal

Notice of Appearance Substitution of Counsel and Designation of Attorney in Charge for Defendant Directv LLC

03/07/2017: Notice of Appearance Substitution of Counsel and Designation of Attorney in Charge for Defendant Directv LLC

Notice of Change of Attorney Facsimile Letter

06/19/2017: Notice of Change of Attorney Facsimile Letter

DCA Generic Letter

06/27/2018: DCA Generic Letter

DCA Generic Letter

07/18/2018: DCA Generic Letter

Notice Of Trial

07/24/2018: Notice Of Trial

Amended Notice Of Trial

08/09/2018: Amended Notice Of Trial

Proposed Order of Dismissal

08/30/2018: Proposed Order of Dismissal

Proposed Master in Chancerys Report to the District Court

08/30/2018: Proposed Master in Chancerys Report to the District Court

Final Notice of Nonsuit

08/30/2018: Final Notice of Nonsuit

DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

09/04/2018: DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • HearingCourt: 555; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • HearingCourt: 555; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Passed; Requesting Party: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • HearingCourt: 555; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Dismissed; Requesting Party: WIEHLE, ELIZABETH ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • HearingCourt: 555; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Re-Set; Requesting Party: WIEHLE, ELIZABETH ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketDescription: DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 9/4/2018;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketDescription: DEFENDANT COSTS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • HearingCourt: 127; Docket Type: Submission Docket (Local Rule 12); Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Passed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 12/9/2016;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: JOHNSON, ALLAN MICHAEL; Person Filing: DIRECTV LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 17;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: DEER PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: CITY OF WEST UNIVERSITY PLACE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: KATY INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: DIRECTV LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT C T CORPORATION SYSTEM; Issued: 1/19/2016; Served: 3/8/2016; Returned: 3/18/2016; Tracking: 73207315; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SONIK, OWEN M.; Person Filing: MEMORIAL VILLAGES WATER AUTHORITY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SONIK, OWEN M.; Person Filing: SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SONIK, OWEN M.; Person Filing: CITY OF SPRING VALLEY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SONIK, OWEN M.; Person Filing: BUNKER HILL VILLAGE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less