This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:03:25 (UTC).

SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRIC vs. RAINEY, JUDITH KATHLEEN

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRIC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against RAINEY, JUDITH KATHLEEN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7761

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendant

RAINEY, JUDITH KATHLEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SONIK, OWEN M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2005
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • SUBSTITUTED SERVICE RECOMMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SONIK, OWEN M. Person Filing - SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less