This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:03:12 (UTC).

SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRIC vs. JANAKEIV, CAROLYN GANT

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRIC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against JANAKEIV, CAROLYN GANT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7759

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

JANAKEIV, CAROLYN GANT

JANAKIEV, VALENTIN

HARRIS COUNTY

CITY OF HOUSTON

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SONIK, OWEN M.

Defendant Attorney

PARMAR, PANKA J. R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2005
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2005
  • DISCLAIMER : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - CITY OF HOUSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2005
  • DISCLAIMER : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2005
  • DISCLAIMER : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2005
  • DISCLAIMER : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2005
  • DISCLAIMER : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2005
  • DISCLAIMER : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SONIK, OWEN M. Person Filing - SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less