This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/16/2020 at 08:06:49 (UTC).

SOUTHERN AUTO FINANCE COMPANY L L C vs. AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOUSTON LP (DOING BUSINESS AS SOUTHWEST

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 SOUTHERN AUTO FINANCE COMPANY L L C filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOUSTON LP DOING BUSINESS AS SOUTHWEST. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9054

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN AUTO FINANCE COMPANY L L C

Defendants

AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOSUTON GP LLC

AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOUSTON LP (DOING BUSINESS AS SOUTHWEST

9201 N Centerall Expressway Fourth Floor

Dallas, TX 75231

SOUTHWEST INFINITI

Others and Defendants

AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOUSTON LP (DOING BUSINESS AS SOUTHWEST

9201 N Centerall Expressway Fourth Floor

Dallas, TX 75231

AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOUSTON GP LLC (LIMITED LIABILITY

9201 N Centeral Expressway Fourth Floor

Dallas, TX 75231

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TURBYFILL, RONALD LEE JR.

 

Court Documents

Citation - AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOUSTON GP LLC

09/28/2020: Citation - AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOUSTON GP LLC

Citation - AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOUSTON LP

09/28/2020: Citation - AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOUSTON LP

Citation not served - AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOUSTON LP

09/28/2020: Citation not served - AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOUSTON LP

Request for Issuance of Service

09/22/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

09/22/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

EXHIBIT B

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT B

EXHIBIT A

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION WITH REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

09/22/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION WITH REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOUSTON GP LLC (LIMITED LIABILITY; Issued: 9/23/2020; Served: 9/24/2020; Received: 9/28/2020; Tracking: 73791096; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AUTOMOBILES OF SOUTHWEST HOUSTON LP (DOING BUSINESS AS SOUTHWEST; Issued: 9/23/2020; Served: 9/24/2020; Received: 9/28/2020; Tracking: 73791095; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TURBYFILL, RONALD LEE JR.; Person Filing: SOUTHERN AUTO FINANCE COMPANY L L C;

    Read MoreRead Less