Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/20/2021 at 01:33:21 (UTC).

SOLANKI, ANIMESH (AS CO-EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ARJUNLAL SOLANKI) vs. KROGER TEXAS L P

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 SOLANKI, ANIMESH AS CO-EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ARJUNLAL SOLANKI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KROGER TEXAS L P. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2203

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOLANKI, JASHAVANTI

SOLANKI, ANIMESH (AS CO-EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ARJUNLAL SOLANKI)

SOLANKI, PRASHANT (AS CO-EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ARJUNLAL SOLANKI)

Defendant

KROGER TEXAS L P

Other

KROGER TEXAS L P (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

211 E 7Th St Suite 620

Austin, TX 79701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HILL, BRETT MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

AKERS, BROCK C.

 

Court Documents

Defendant's First Amended Original Answer

02/10/2021: Defendant's First Amended Original Answer

Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions relating to Animesh Solanki

02/19/2021: Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions relating to Animesh Solanki

Affidavit of Service

01/21/2021: Affidavit of Service

Defendant's Original Answer

01/22/2021: Defendant's Original Answer

Jury Demand

01/22/2021: Jury Demand

Plaintiffs' 1st Amended Original Petition

02/01/2021: Plaintiffs' 1st Amended Original Petition

Plaintiffs Original Petition & Discovery Requests

01/14/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition & Discovery Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: KROGER TEXAS L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HILL, BRETT MICHAEL; Person Filing: SOLANKI, JASHAVANTI;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HILL, BRETT MICHAEL; Person Filing: SOLANKI, ANIMESH (AS CO-EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ARJUNLAL SOLANKI);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HILL, BRETT MICHAEL; Person Filing: SOLANKI, PRASHANT (AS CO-EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ARJUNLAL SOLANKI);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: KROGER TEXAS L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: KROGER TEXAS L P (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 1/14/2021; Served: 1/19/2021; Received: 1/21/2021; Tracking: 73830968; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HILL, BRETT MICHAEL; Person Filing: SOLANKI, ANIMESH (AS CO-EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ARJUNLAL SOLANKI);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HILL, BRETT MICHAEL; Person Filing: SOLANKI, PRASHANT (AS CO-EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ARJUNLAL SOLANKI);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HILL, BRETT MICHAEL; Person Filing: SOLANKI, JASHAVANTI;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKERS, BROCK C.