This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:35:17 (UTC).

SIMS, PRISCILLA M vs. RELLFORD, MARK ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 SIMS, PRISCILLA M filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RELLFORD, MARK ANTHONY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1673

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMS, PRISCILLA M

Defendant

RELLFORD, MARK ANTHONY

Houston, TX 77065

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KACHNIK, ANDREW JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Affidavit/Return of Service

06/02/2020: Affidavit/Return of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

05/26/2020: CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION JURY DEMAND RULE 194 REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

05/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION JURY DEMAND RULE 194 REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RELLFORD, MARK ANTHONY; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/30/2020; Tracking: 73753018; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KACHNIK, ANDREW JOSEPH; Person Filing: SIMS, PRISCILLA M;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less