This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/05/2022 at 07:40:56 (UTC).

SIMPSON, CODY MILLS vs. NASSAU BAY POLICE DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 SIMPSON, CODY MILLS filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against NASSAU BAY POLICE DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8609

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMPSON, CODY MILLS

Defendants

NASSAU BAY POLICE DEPARTMENT

1800 Space Park Drive

Houston, TX 77058

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION

SOURCE FOR PUBLIC DATA, LP

7750 North Macarthur Blvd,

Irving, TX 75063

GALVESTON COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

5700 Avenue H,

Galveston, TX 77551

GALVESTON COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

600 59Th Street,

Galveston, TX 77551

LEAGUE CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT

555 W Walker Street, League

City, TX 77573

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZENDEH DEL, JONATHAN ARASH

Defendant Attorney

RISNER, BOBBIE K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • HearingCourt: 055; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RISNER, BOBBIE K.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LEAGUE CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74012219; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GALVESTON COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74012218; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GALVESTON COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74012216; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SOURCE FOR PUBLIC DATA, LP; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74012214; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NASSAU BAY POLICE DEPARTMENT; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74012213; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74005562; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74005561; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN BANKS; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74005560; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74005559; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74005558; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN BANKS; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74005557; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74005556; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74005555; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74005554; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 6/1/2022; Tracking: 74005553; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 5/24/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZENDEH DEL, JONATHAN ARASH; Person Filing: SIMPSON, CODY MILLS;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Source for Public Data, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Galveston County Sheriff is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES is a litigant