Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/05/2021 at 07:50:41 (UTC).

SIMPLOT AB RETAIL INC (D/B/A SIMPLOT GROWER SOLUTIONS) vs. BASIC ENERGY SERVICES LP

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 SIMPLOT AB RETAIL INC D/B/A SIMPLOT GROWER SOLUTIONS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BASIC ENERGY SERVICES LP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1747

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIMPLOT AB RETAIL INC (D/B/A SIMPLOT GROWER SOLUTIONS)

SIMPLOT GROWER SOLUTIONS

Defendants

BASIC ENERGY SERVICES LP

BASIC ENERGY SERVICES GP LLC

Others

BASIC ENERGY SERVICES GP LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

BASIC ENERGY SERVICES LP MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUELLAR, JAMES E.

 

Court Documents

Citation

01/28/2021: Citation

Citation

01/28/2021: Citation

Request for Issuance of Service

01/12/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

01/12/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Exhibit B

01/12/2021: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

01/12/2021: Exhibit A

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION WITH REQUESTS PURSUANT TO RULES 194 196 197 AND 198 TEX R CIV P

01/12/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION WITH REQUESTS PURSUANT TO RULES 194 196 197 AND 198 TEX R CIV P

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BASIC ENERGY SERVICES LP MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 1/13/2021; Tracking: 73830266; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BASIC ENERGY SERVICES GP LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 1/13/2021; Served: 1/21/2021; Tracking: 73830264; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CUELLAR, JAMES E.; Person Filing: SIMPLOT GROWER SOLUTIONS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CUELLAR, JAMES E.; Person Filing: SIMPLOT AB RETAIL INC (D/B/A SIMPLOT GROWER SOLUTIONS);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Basic Energy Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Simplot Grower Solutions is a litigant

Latest cases where Simplot AB Retail, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUELLAR, JAMES E.