This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/12/2021 at 08:13:19 (UTC).

SIMMER, RICKEY A vs. DON MCGILL OF KATY LTD

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 SIMMER, RICKEY A filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DON MCGILL OF KATY LTD. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4937

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMMER, RICKEY A

Houston, TX 77002

Defendants

DON MCGILL OF KATY LTD

DON MCGILL OF WEST HOUSTON (D/B/A DON MCGILL TOYOTA)

Other

DON MCGILL OF KATY LTD (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS

5051 Westheimer Suite 1200

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG, GREGG M.

Defendant Attorney

ALFARO-DE LA VEGA, SONIA B.

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Request

04/12/2017: Civil Process Request

Civil Case Information Sheet

04/12/2017: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiff's Original Petition

04/12/2017: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation Corporate

04/19/2017: Citation Corporate

Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition

06/26/2017: Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition

Defendant's Original Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition

07/20/2017: Defendant's Original Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

02/08/2018: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER

07/18/2018: TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER

Notice of Oral Hearing

09/04/2018: Notice of Oral Hearing

Proposed Order Granting Defendant's No Evidence and Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff

09/04/2018: Proposed Order Granting Defendant's No Evidence and Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff

Exhibit 05

09/04/2018: Exhibit 05

Exhibit 04

09/04/2018: Exhibit 04

Exhibit 03

09/04/2018: Exhibit 03

Exhibit 02

09/04/2018: Exhibit 02

Defendant's No Evidence and Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff

09/04/2018: Defendant's No Evidence and Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff

Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice

09/20/2018: Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice

DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

09/27/2018: DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

Proposed Order Granting Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice

09/27/2018: Proposed Order Granting Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • HearingCourt: 011; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: SUMMARY JUDGMENT-PARTIAL (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 166A); Results: Passed; Comments: DEF ANDREA, CASE SETTLED 09/06; Requesting Party: ALFARO-DE LA VEGA, SONIA B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • HearingCourt: 011; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Passed; Comments: CASE DISP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 9/27/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 2/8/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ALFARO-DE LA VEGA, SONIA B.; Person Filing: DON MCGILL OF WEST HOUSTON (D/B/A DON MCGILL TOYOTA);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROSENBERG, GREGG M.; Person Filing: SIMMER, RICKEY A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ALFARO-DE LA VEGA, SONIA B.; Person Filing: DON MCGILL OF KATY LTD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: DON MCGILL OF KATY LTD (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 4/13/2017; Served: 4/18/2017; Tracking: 73362669; Deliver To: CIV AGCY-CIVILIAN SERVICE AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROSENBERG, GREGG M.; Person Filing: SIMMER, RICKEY A;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenberg, Gregg M