This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/28/2020 at 07:40:15 (UTC).

SIFUENTES, EULALIO vs. KIEWIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 SIFUENTES, EULALIO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KIEWIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3822

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIFUENTES, EULALIO

Defendants

RAMIREZ GARCIA, EDWARD

Prairie, TX 75051

KIEWIT CORPORATION

Other

KEIWIT CORPORATION (IS A TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

1999 Bryan St Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORALES, MOISES III

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff Original Petition

09/04/2020: Plaintiff Original Petition

Service Request

09/04/2020: Service Request

Service Request

09/04/2020: Service Request

Return of Service

09/14/2020: Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: KEIWIT CORPORATION (IS A TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 9/8/2020; Tracking: 73784842; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RAMIREZ GARCIA, EDWARD; Issued: 9/8/2020; Served: 9/11/2020; Received: 9/14/2020; Tracking: 73784840; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MORALES, MOISES III; Person Filing: SIFUENTES, EULALIO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIEWIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORALES, MOISES III