This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/20/2022 at 07:57:56 (UTC).

SHREVE, DOUGLAS vs. STATE FARM LLOYDS

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 SHREVE, DOUGLAS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM LLOYDS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is C. ELLIOTT THORNTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2014

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

C. ELLIOTT THORNTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHREVE, DOUGLAS

Defendants

STATE FARM LLOYDS

ROSS, KEYON

Houston, TX 77021

Other

STATE FARM LLOYDS MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUNNINGHAM, VICKERS JR.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

09/26/2022: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

09/26/2022: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

09/26/2022: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

Return of Service-STATE FARM LLOYDS

10/11/2022: Return of Service-STATE FARM LLOYDS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ROSS, KEYON; Issued: 9/28/2022; Tracking: 74057936; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: STATE FARM LLOYDS MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 9/28/2022; Served: 10/4/2022; Received: 10/12/2022; Tracking: 74057934; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CUNNINGHAM, VICKERS JR.; Person Filing: SHREVE, DOUGLAS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Lloyds as Subrogee of Bryan Dietzel is a litigant