This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:05:45 (UTC).

SHOTWELL, CHRISTOPHER vs. SHOTWELL, CHARRIDY

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 SHOTWELL, CHRISTOPHER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHOTWELL, CHARRIDY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8032

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHOTWELL, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant

SHOTWELL, CHARRIDY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2015
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DEFAULT JDGMT (PJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • IV-D MASTER SIGNED ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • MOTION TO ENFORCE (FAMILY) : Filing Attorney - OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, 615 Person Filing - OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2005
  • ORDER SGND GRNTG QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2004
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less