Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:33:26 (UTC).

SHLP 2125 YALE LLC vs. SMITH, KATIE

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 SHLP 2125 YALE LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SMITH, KATIE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9420

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHLP 2125 YALE LLC

Defendant

SMITH, KATIE

Houston, TX 77025

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAMISON, JOHN C

JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.

9821 Katy Freew

Houston, TX 77024

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

05/14/2020: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

Proposed Order for Substituted Service

04/17/2020: Proposed Order for Substituted Service

Motion for Rule 106 Service

04/17/2020: Motion for Rule 106 Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/14/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SMITH, KATIE; Issued: 3/27/2020; Tracking: 73738566; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JENKINS, JODY DEWAYNE; Person Filing: SHLP 2125 YALE LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less