This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/30/2020 at 07:43:23 (UTC).

SHIM, JAE WON (D/B/A J S MART) vs. B & SONS CONSTRUCTION LLC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 SHIM, JAE WON D/B/A J S MART filed an Other lawsuit against B SONS CONSTRUCTION LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9748

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

J S MART

SHIM, JAE WON (D/B/A J S MART)

Defendants

PHAM, BE V

Houston, TX 77037

B & SONS CONSTRUCTION LLC

Other

B & SONS CONSTRUCTION LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE

522 Shane Street

Houston, TX 77037

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHANG, HOJOON

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

07/21/2020: Affidavit of Service

Certificate of Service

07/27/2020: Certificate of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

07/06/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

07/06/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

07/06/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: B & SONS CONSTRUCTION LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE; Issued: 7/6/2020; Tracking: 73764082; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PHAM, BE V; Issued: 7/6/2020; Served: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73764080; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WHANG, HOJOON; Person Filing: J S MART;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WHANG, HOJOON; Person Filing: SHIM, JAE WON (D/B/A J S MART);

    Read MoreRead Less