This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/27/2022 at 07:34:54 (UTC).

SHIELDS, ROBERT C vs. 3M CO (A/K/A MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING CO)

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 SHIELDS, ROBERT C filed an Other lawsuit against 3M CO A/K/A MINNESOTA MINING MANUFACTURING CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6461

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIELDS, ROBERT C

Defendants

3M CO (A/K/A MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING CO)

4520 CORPORATION INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO THE

ABLE SUPPLY CO

AMETEK INC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR TO HAVEG INDUSTRIES INC AND AS

ASHLAND LLC (F/K/A ASHLAND INC (AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO

BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-

ERICSSON INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

CHAMPION OIL COMPANY

CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION (F/K/A HERCULES INC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR-IN-

CRANE CO (SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CHAPMAN VALVE COMPANY) (SUCCESSOR-

ELLIOTT COMPANY (F/K/A AND D/B/A ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO)

EXXON MO CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION (F/K/A THE DURIRON COMPANY INC (SUED AS

FLOWSERVE US INC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR TO EDWARD VALVE INC) (SUED AS

FMC CORPORATION (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-

GOULDS PUMPS INCORPORATED

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK

Defendant Attorneys

BROWN, KEVIN BARBER

WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE

AVILES, ARTURO M.

MURPHY, MITCHELL MADDOX

EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD

GARDNER, STEPHEN SHAYNE

WARE, JAMES L.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

Other Attorneys

BUNCH, WAYNE P. JR.

KAROS, MARIA KATINA

RHODES, KENNETH D.

SKAGGS, JERAMY MITCHELL

 

Court Documents

Defendant Champlain Cable Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Subject to its Motion to Transfer Venue

05/06/2022: Defendant Champlain Cable Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Subject to its Motion to Transfer Venue

Defendant Ashland LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Subject to its Motion to Transfer Venue

05/06/2022: Defendant Ashland LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Subject to its Motion to Transfer Venue

Defendant Ametek, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Subject to its Motion to Transfer Venue

05/06/2022: Defendant Ametek, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Subject to its Motion to Transfer Venue

Defendant Hercules LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Subject to its Motion to Transfer Venue

05/06/2022: Defendant Hercules LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Subject to its Motion to Transfer Venue

Filing letter for Answer and Jury Demand

05/06/2022: Filing letter for Answer and Jury Demand

JURY DEMAND

05/06/2022: JURY DEMAND

ORIGINAL ANSWER OF FLOWSERVE CORPORATION F/K/A THE DURIRON COMPANY INC MISNAMED AS FLOWSERVE CORPORATION F/K/A THE DURIRON COMPANY INC (sued as successor-by-merger to DURCO INTERNATIONAL)

05/06/2022: ORIGINAL ANSWER OF FLOWSERVE CORPORATION F/K/A THE DURIRON COMPANY INC MISNAMED AS FLOWSERVE CORPORATION F/K/A THE DURIRON COMPANY INC (sued as successor-by-merger to DURCO INTERNATIONAL)

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS JURY DEMAND

05/16/2022: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS JURY DEMAND

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

05/16/2022: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

05/16/2022: Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF ADOPTION AND JOINDER OF ITS MDL PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY RESPONSES

05/16/2022: DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF ADOPTION AND JOINDER OF ITS MDL PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY RESPONSES

DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATIONS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND ORIGINAL ANSWER, SUBJECT THERETO, TO PLAINTIFFS PETITION AND JURY DEMAND

05/16/2022: DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATIONS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND ORIGINAL ANSWER, SUBJECT THERETO, TO PLAINTIFFS PETITION AND JURY DEMAND

PROPOSED ORDER

05/18/2022: PROPOSED ORDER

DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, AND SUBJECT THERETO, ORIGINAL ANSWER AND ANSWER TO ALL CROSS ACTIONS

05/18/2022: DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, AND SUBJECT THERETO, ORIGINAL ANSWER AND ANSWER TO ALL CROSS ACTIONS

Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition, Answer to Cross-Actions and Request for Bifurcated Trial

05/19/2022: Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition, Answer to Cross-Actions and Request for Bifurcated Trial

Defendant, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.'s Original Answer Subject to its Motion to Transfer Venue

05/19/2022: Defendant, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.'s Original Answer Subject to its Motion to Transfer Venue

Defendant, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.'s Motion to Transfer Venue

05/19/2022: Defendant, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.'s Motion to Transfer Venue

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S SPECIAL APPEARANCE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, AND SUBJECT THERETO, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS MOST RECENT PETITION, ANSWER TO CROSS ACTIONS AND/OR THIRD PARTY ACTIONS

05/20/2022: DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S SPECIAL APPEARANCE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, AND SUBJECT THERETO, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS MOST RECENT PETITION, ANSWER TO CROSS ACTIONS AND/OR THIRD PARTY ACTIONS

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD; Person Filing: SHELL OIL COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD; Person Filing: ITT CORPORATION (F/K/A ITT INDUSTRIES INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: ELLISTON, GARY D.; Person Filing: RILEY STOLKER CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ELLISTON, GARY D.; Person Filing: FMC CORPORATION (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: ELLISTON, GARY D.; Person Filing: RILEY POWER INC (F/K/A RILEY STOKER CORPORATION AND D B RILEY INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: ELLISTON, GARY D.; Person Filing: D B RILEY INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD; Person Filing: ELLIOTT COMPANY (F/K/A AND D/B/A ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AVILES, ARTURO M.; Person Filing: BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WARE, JAMES L.; Person Filing: THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GARDNER, STEPHEN SHAYNE; Person Filing: EXXON MO CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE; Person Filing: ASHLAND LLC (F/K/A ASHLAND INC (AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE; Person Filing: AMETEK INC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR TO HAVEG INDUSTRIES INC AND AS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE; Person Filing: ASHLAND INC AND (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO HERCULES INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WARE, JAMES L.; Person Filing: FLOWSERVE CORPORATION F/K/A THE DURIRON COMPANY INC MISNAMED AS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WARE, JAMES L.; Person Filing: FLOWSERVE CORPORATION (F/K/A THE DURIRON COMPANY INC (SUED AS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE; Person Filing: CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION (F/K/A HERCULES INC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR-IN-;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE; Person Filing: HERCULES LLC (F/K/A HERCULES INCORP);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK; Person Filing: SHIELDS, ROBERT C;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOULDS PUMPS INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where ASHLAND INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Blount International Inc. is a litigant