This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 00:28:13 (UTC).

SHERWOOD FOREST LAND DEVELOPMENT LLC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 SHERWOOD FOREST LAND DEVELOPMENT LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOT DOLLINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2524

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOT DOLLINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHERWOOD FOREST LAND DEVELOPMENT LLC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT BY SERVING THE CHIEF APPRAISER

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLE, KENNETH RYAN

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

01/13/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Citation

01/31/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT BY SERVING THE CHIEF APPRAISER; Issued: 1/14/2022; Served: 1/28/2022; Returned: 1/28/2022; Tracking: 73961228; Deliver To: CONST 1 ALAN ROSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COLE, KENNETH RYAN; Person Filing: SHERWOOD FOREST LAND DEVELOPMENT LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLE , KENNETH RYAN