This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/13/2021 at 07:47:17 (UTC).

SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. TJM BARKLEY & ASSOCIATES INC DBA HAWG STOP

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against TJM BARKLEY ASSOCIATES INC DBA HAWG STOP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2246

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAWN ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

SHELDON ROAD MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT

Defendants

TJM BARKLEY & ASSOCIATES INC DBA HAWG STOP

HAWG STOP

Other

TJM BARKLEY & ASSCIATES DBA HAW STOP BY SERVING ITS

11335 Sheldon Road

Houston, TX 77044

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SONIK, OWEN M.

 

Court Documents

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

08/20/2021: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

08/20/2021: PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TJM BARKLEY & ASSCIATES DBA HAW STOP BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 8/24/2021; Served: 8/30/2021; Received: 9/8/2021; Tracking: 73904772; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SONIK, OWEN M.; Person Filing: SHELDON ROAD MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SONIK, OWEN M.; Person Filing: SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHELDON ROAD MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SONIK, OWEN M