This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/01/2021 at 20:15:08 (UTC).

SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. GONZALEZ, BRANDI NICOLE

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GONZALEZ, BRANDI NICOLE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2666

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

AT&T ADVERTISING LP

DEX MEDIA INC (IN REM ONLY) (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AT&T

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

ROBIN, JENNY ELIZABETH

Houston, TX 77015

ROBIN, ADDISON BY TRUSTEE KATHY LYNN BARRERA ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS

Humble, TX 77346

MCCOLLUM, HALEY NICOLE BY TRUSTEE TINA ANN MALTOS

Crosby, TX 77532

ROBIN, LEVI BY TRUSTEE KATHY LYNN BARRERA ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS

Humble, TX 77346

GONZALEZ, BRANDI NICOLE

Houston, TX 77044

BARRERA, KATHY LYNN

RYAL, THOMAS DAVID BY TRUSTEE TINA ANN MALTOS

Crosby, TX 77532

MALTOS, TINA ANN

Crosby, TX 77532

MALTON, TINA ANN

Other and Defendant

DEX MEDIA INC (IN REM ONLY) (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AT&T

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SONIK, OWEN M.

Defendant Attorney

COTTEN, WESTON G.

 

Court Documents

ALIAS CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

03/12/2021: ALIAS CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

ALIAS CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

03/12/2021: ALIAS CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

COVER LETTER

03/12/2021: COVER LETTER

Citation Return re: DEX Media, Inc.

03/19/2021: Citation Return re: DEX Media, Inc.

Citation

02/08/2021: Citation

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

01/26/2021: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

01/26/2021: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Sheldon Independent School District Et Al's Initial Disclosures, Testifying Expert Disclosures and Pretrial Disclosure

01/27/2021: Sheldon Independent School District Et Al's Initial Disclosures, Testifying Expert Disclosures and Pretrial Disclosure

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

01/28/2021: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

01/28/2021: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

01/15/2021: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

01/15/2021: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

01/15/2021: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

01/15/2021: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

01/15/2021: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

01/15/2021: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION BY PUBLICATION

01/15/2021: CITATION BY PUBLICATION

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

01/15/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COTTEN, WESTON G.; Person Filing: MALTON, TINA ANN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ROBIN, JENNY ELIZABETH; Issued: 1/15/2021; Returned: 2/5/2021; Received: 2/8/2021; Tracking: 73831616; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ROBIN, LEVI BY TRUSTEE KATHY LYNN BARRERA ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS; Issued: 1/15/2021; Returned: 1/26/2021; Received: 1/28/2021; Tracking: 73831613; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ROBIN, ADDISON BY TRUSTEE KATHY LYNN BARRERA ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS; Issued: 1/15/2021; Returned: 1/26/2021; Received: 1/28/2021; Tracking: 73831610; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RYAL, THOMAS DAVID BY TRUSTEE TINA ANN MALTOS; Issued: 1/15/2021; Served: 1/20/2021; Returned: 1/22/2021; Received: 1/26/2021; Tracking: 73831608; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MCCOLLUM, HALEY NICOLE BY TRUSTEE TINA ANN MALTOS; Issued: 1/15/2021; Served: 1/20/2021; Returned: 1/22/2021; Received: 1/26/2021; Tracking: 73831606; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MALTOS, TINA ANN; Issued: 1/15/2021; Served: 1/20/2021; Returned: 1/22/2021; Received: 1/26/2021; Tracking: 73831604; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GONZALEZ, BRANDI NICOLE; Issued: 1/15/2021; Returned: 1/22/2021; Received: 1/26/2021; Tracking: 73831602; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: DEX MEDIA INC (IN REM ONLY) (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AT&T Issued: 1/15/2021; Served: 2/10/2021; Tracking: 73831599; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SONIK, OWEN M.; Person Filing: SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T ADVERTISING LP is a litigant

Latest cases where SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where Dex Media, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COTTEN WESTON G.