This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/25/2015 at 19:32:45 (UTC).

SHELDON, EARNEST OSCAR vs. QUIGLEY COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 05/03/2004 SHELDON, EARNEST OSCAR filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against QUIGLEY COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2870

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

LERMAN, ARTURO

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

QUIGLEY COMPANY INC

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

AMETEK INC (SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO HAVEG INDUSTRIES INC)

ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA DB RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

DP RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CHAMPLAIN CABLE COMPANY (FKA HERCULES INC)

HERCULES INC

CHEMPRENE INC (SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO HERCULES PACKING CORPORATION)

CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC (SUCCESSOR TO MUNDET CORK COMPANY)

FLINTKOTE COMPANY

FOSECO INC

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

KALE, JEFFERY TODD

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

HOGAN, TIMOTHY J.

CALDERON, RAUL M.

KISLUK, EILEEN WILSON

WHITE, CLAY M.

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

ELLISTON, GARY D.

BERNER, HEATHER ANN

Other Attorneys

SPENCER, JOE AURELIANO JR.

LABOON, JOHN ANDREW

MOIR, PETER A.

SHEEHY, RICHARD A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2015
  • PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COLLEY, CHRISTOPHER CHAMBLIS Person Filing - SHELDON, EARNEST OSCAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WHITE, CLAY M. Person Filing - OGLEBAY NORTON COMPANY (AND ITS DIVISION FERO ENGINEERING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KISLUK, EILEEN WILSON Person Filing - AMETEK INC (SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO HAVEG INDUSTRIES INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2004
  • FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KISLUK, EILEEN WILSON Person Filing - AMETEK INC (SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO HAVEG INDUSTRIES INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2004
  • FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KISLUK, EILEEN WILSON Person Filing - CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION INCORRECTLY NAMED AND SUED AS CHAMPLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2004
  • FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KISLUK, EILEEN WILSON Person Filing - CHAMPLAIN CABLE COMPANY (FKA HERCULES INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHEEHY, RICHARD A. Person Filing - TH AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION L L C (SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO TH

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2004
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CALDERON, RAUL M. Person Filing - CHAMPLAIN CABLE COMPANY (FKA HERCULES INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2004
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CALDERON, RAUL M. Person Filing - CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION INCORRECTLY NAMED AND SUED AS CHAMPLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CALDERON, RAUL M. Person Filing - CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION INCORRECTLY NAMED AND SUED AS CHAMPLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KALE, JEFFERY TODD Person Filing - SHELDON, EARNEST OSCAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KALE, JEFFERY TODD Person Filing - LERMAN, ARTURO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KALE, JEFFERY TODD Person Filing - SHADRACH, ROGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KALE, JEFFERY TODD Person Filing - SHELDON, EARNEST OSCAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KALE, JEFFERY TODD Person Filing - SHADRACH, ROGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KALE, JEFFERY TODD Person Filing - Not Downloaded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KALE, JEFFERY TODD Person Filing - LERMAN, ARTURO

    Read MoreRead Less