This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/04/2021 at 07:34:43 (UTC).

SHARMA, GANESH vs. HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 SHARMA, GANESH filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5165

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAWN ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHARMA, GANESH

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

OCA EXPUNCTIONS - LEGAL DIVISION

205 W. 14Th Street,

Austin, TX 78701

HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES

HOUSTON CITY JAIL

HARRIS COUNTY JAIL

TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

JUSTICE INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS

SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker St

Houston, TX 77011

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Fl

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRE-TRAIL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHEY, SARA BETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingCourt: 334; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OCA EXPUNCTIONS - LEGAL DIVISION; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73883792; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (SETCIC) BY SERVING; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73881653; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JUSTICE INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEM (JIMS) BY SERVING; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73881652; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73881651; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73881650; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY JAIL BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73881649; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON CITY JAIL BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73881648; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73881645; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73881643; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRE-TRAIL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73881642; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73881641; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73881640; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73881639; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73881638; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 6/18/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RICHEY, SARA BETH; Person Filing: SHARMA, GANESH;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSTON CITY JAIL is a litigant

Latest cases where JUSTICE INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (SETCIC) ATTN: EXPUNCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER is a litigant