This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/07/2021 at 07:39:31 (UTC).

SHARIF, ROWSHONARA vs. BAYTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 SHARIF, ROWSHONARA filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against BAYTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRITTANYE MORRIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8747

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BRITTANYE MORRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHARIF, ROWSHONARA

Defendants and Others

BAYTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

OCA EXPUNCTIONS - LEGAL DIVISION

HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES

HOUSTON CITY JAIL

HARRIS COUNTY JAIL

TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEYS' OFFICE

JUSTICE INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS

SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHEY, SARA BETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 9/30/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RICHEY, SARA BETH; Person Filing: SHARIF, ROWSHONARA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSTON CITY JAIL is a litigant

Latest cases where JUSTICE INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER is a litigant