Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:49:35 (UTC).

SHAH, SAIRA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF Y I) (A MINOR) vs. PLAYCORE INC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 SHAH, SAIRA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF Y I A MINOR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PLAYCORE INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is R. K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9576

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

R. K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHAH, SAIRA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF Y I) (A MINOR)

I, Y (MINOR)

MASOOD, SYED AAMIR

Defendants

PLAYCORE WISCONSIN INC (D/B/A GAMETIME)

NORTH AMERICAN ISLAMIC TRUST INC

PLAYCORE HOLDINGS INC

ISLAMIC SOCIETY OF GREATER HOUSTON INC

PLAYCORE INC

WADE CONTRACTORS INC

MARYAM ISLAMIC CENTER

TOTAL RECREATION PRODUCTS INC

Others

WADE CONTRACTORS INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

11715 Meadow Falls

Tomball, TX 77377

PLAYCORE HOLDINGS INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE

51209 Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

TOTAL RECREATION PRODUCTS INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY

17802 Grant Road

Cypress, TX 77429

MARYAM ISLAMIC CENTER MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

3110 Eastside Street

Houston, TX 77098

ISLAMIC SOCIETY OF GREATER HOUSTON INC (TEXAS NONPROFIT

3110 Eastside Street

Houston, TX 77098

PLAYCORE WISCONSIN INC (D/B/A GAMETIME) (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

NORTH AMERICAN ISLAMIC TRUST INC (FOREIGN NONPROFIT CORPORATION) MAY

2530 Estaril Circle

Houston, TX 77038

PLAYCORE INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

251 Little Falls Drive

Wilmington, DE 19808

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZ, MUHAMMAD SULEIMAN

Defendant Attorneys

BULLION, DEBORAH JEAN

SHEINESS, MARC A.

ENGLAND, JUSTIN PATRICK

 

Court Documents

The North American Islamic Trust Inc ("NAIT") Original Answer to Plaintiffs Original Petition

04/20/2020: The North American Islamic Trust Inc ("NAIT") Original Answer to Plaintiffs Original Petition

Citation (Wade Contractors Inc)

04/22/2020: Citation (Wade Contractors Inc)

Citation (North American Islamic Trust Inc)

04/22/2020: Citation (North American Islamic Trust Inc)

Ciation (Maryam Islamic Center)

04/23/2020: Ciation (Maryam Islamic Center)

Ciation (Islamic Society of Greater Houston Inc)

04/23/2020: Ciation (Islamic Society of Greater Houston Inc)

Defendant's Notice of Deficiency of and Objection to Plaintiffs' Rule 193.7 Notice

04/24/2020: Defendant's Notice of Deficiency of and Objection to Plaintiffs' Rule 193.7 Notice

Defendant Total Recreation Products Inc's Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

04/24/2020: Defendant Total Recreation Products Inc's Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Correspondence

04/24/2020: Correspondence

Defendants' Notice of Deficiency of and Objection to Plaintiffs' Rule 193.7 Notice

04/24/2020: Defendants' Notice of Deficiency of and Objection to Plaintiffs' Rule 193.7 Notice

Defendants Playcore Inc Playcore Wisconsin Inc d/b/a Gametime Playcore Holding Inc's Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

04/24/2020: Defendants Playcore Inc Playcore Wisconsin Inc d/b/a Gametime Playcore Holding Inc's Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

05/05/2020: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

Defendant Wade Contractors, Inc.'s Original Answer to Plaintiff

05/08/2020: Defendant Wade Contractors, Inc.'s Original Answer to Plaintiff

Islamic Society Of Greater, Inc. and Maryam Islamic Centers Original Answer To Plaintiffs Original Petition

05/11/2020: Islamic Society Of Greater, Inc. and Maryam Islamic Centers Original Answer To Plaintiffs Original Petition

Citation (Playcore Wisconsin Inc)

04/06/2020: Citation (Playcore Wisconsin Inc)

Citation (Playcore Inc)

04/16/2020: Citation (Playcore Inc)

Citation (Playcore Holdings Inc)

04/16/2020: Citation (Playcore Holdings Inc)

Citation (Total Recreation Products Inc)

04/16/2020: Citation (Total Recreation Products Inc)

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • HearingCourt: 127; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SHEINESS, MARC A.; Person Filing: ISLAMIC SOCIETY OF GREATER HOUSTON INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SHEINESS, MARC A.; Person Filing: MARYAM ISLAMIC CENTER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ENGLAND, JUSTIN PATRICK; Person Filing: WADE CONTRACTORS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BULLION, DEBORAH JEAN; Person Filing: TOTAL RECREATION PRODUCTS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BULLION, DEBORAH JEAN; Person Filing: PLAYCORE WISCONSIN INC (D/B/A GAMETIME);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BULLION, DEBORAH JEAN; Person Filing: PLAYCORE INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MARYAM ISLAMIC CENTER MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 3/31/2020; Served: 4/8/2020; Tracking: 73738631; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ISLAMIC SOCIETY OF GREATER HOUSTON INC (TEXAS NONPROFIT; Issued: 3/31/2020; Served: 4/8/2020; Tracking: 73738630; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WADE CONTRACTORS INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 3/31/2020; Served: 4/14/2020; Tracking: 73738629; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TOTAL RECREATION PRODUCTS INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY; Issued: 3/31/2020; Served: 4/9/2020; Tracking: 73738628; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE CORPORATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PLAYCORE HOLDINGS INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 3/31/2020; Served: 4/6/2020; Tracking: 73738627; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PLAYCORE WISCONSIN INC (D/B/A GAMETIME) (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT; Issued: 3/31/2020; Served: 4/1/2020; Tracking: 73738626; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE CORPORATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PLAYCORE INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 3/31/2020; Served: 4/6/2020; Tracking: 73738625; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AZIZ, MUHAMMAD SULEIMAN; Person Filing: SHAH, SAIRA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF Y I) (A MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AZIZ, MUHAMMAD SULEIMAN; Person Filing: MASOOD, SYED AAMIR;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AZIZ, MUHAMMAD SULEIMAN; Person Filing: I, Y (MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLAYCORE WISCONSIN, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AZIZ, MUHAMMAD SULEIMAN