This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/17/2022 at 04:20:18 (UTC).

SEYMOUR, CESAR XAVIER vs. OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 SEYMOUR, CESAR XAVIER filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9709

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEYMOUR, CESAR XAVIER

Defendants

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE CJAD

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CSCD

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCES

PASADENA POLICE DEPARTMENT

PASADENA MUNICIPAL COURT

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN BANKS

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING RHONDA A REECE

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

1 More Parties Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • HearingCourt: 127; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 8/16/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: SEYMOUR, CESAR XAVIER;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASADENA MUNICIPAL COURT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCES is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CSCD is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD is a litigant