This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/26/2022 at 07:32:18 (UTC).

SEIFERT, WADE vs. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 SEIFERT, WADE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2100

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEIFERT, WADE

Defendants

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

EBENEZER INTEGRATED LOGISTICS LLC

Other

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (A FOREIGN RAILROAD CORPORATION) BY

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZITO, MARC A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Request

11/02/2022: Civil Process Request

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

11/02/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Certified Mail Tracking #7019 2280 0000 0786 2057

11/04/2022: Certified Mail Tracking #7019 2280 0000 0786 2057

Certified Mail Receipt

11/07/2022: Certified Mail Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (A FOREIGN RAILROAD CORPORATION) BY; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74073731; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZITO, MARC A.; Person Filing: SEIFERT, WADE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZITO, MARC A