This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:21:52 (UTC).

SEARS, JOCELYN MARIE vs. MENDOZA, FELIX

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 SEARS, JOCELYN MARIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MENDOZA, FELIX. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8564

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MENDOZA, FELIX

ALFARO, GLORIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, DAVID MODESTO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2007
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2007
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2007
  • FIFTH AMENDED ANSWER THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITI : Filing Attorney - MILLER, DAVID LESTER Person Filing - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2005
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - WHITE, CARLETTE Person Filing - MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HERNANDEZ, DAVID MODESTO Person Filing - ALFARO, GLORIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MILLER, DAVID LESTER Person Filing - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALDMAN, STEVE Person Filing - SEARS, JOCELYN MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less