This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:15:36 (UTC).

SCULLY, DANIEL vs. TONELLA, JESSICA

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 SCULLY, DANIEL filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against TONELLA, JESSICA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0658

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCULLY, DANIEL

Defendant

TONELLA, JESSICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MULLER,MATTHEW S

Defendant Attorney

MAHENDRU, ASHISH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MOTION TO REMOVE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2005
  • DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MULLER,MATTHEW S Person Filing - SCULLY, DANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MAHENDRU, ASHISH Person Filing - TONELLA, JESSICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MAHENDRU, ASHISH Person Filing - TONELLA, JESSICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MULLER,MATTHEW S Person Filing - SCULLY, DANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less