This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/07/2015 at 18:12:54 (UTC).

SCHUTZ, BENJAMIN HARRISON vs. A W CHESTERTON

Case Summary

On 04/03/2006 SCHUTZ, BENJAMIN HARRISON filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0996

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2006

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

SCHUTZ, BENJAMIN HARRISON

SCHUTZ, BETTY J

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

A W CHESTERTON

ABLE SUPPLY CO

AJAX BOILER INC

ADVANCED THERMAL HYDRONICS INC (FKA HYDROTHERM CORPORATION)

ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA L L C

ALCOA INC (AKA ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA)

ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AMETEK INC

AO SMITH CORPORATION

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA DB RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER CORPORATION)

DB RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC

BALTIMORE ENNIS LAND COMPANY INC

BECHTEL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

BECHTEL CORP (FKA SEQUOIA VENTURES INC)

83 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

Defendant Attorneys

ALMQUIST, ARTHUR RAY

JACKSON, JESSICA S.

POWELL, LISA A.

COUGILL, THOMAS L.

FRASE, LAURA ANN

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

CALDERON, RAUL M.

CARLSON, ERIC

ELLISTON, GARY D.

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

ARREDONDO, ROBERT DAVID

Other Attorneys

POWERS, JAMES H.

LEDYARD, DAVID W.

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

VANCLEAVE, MARK DEAN

ADAMS, KENT M.

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

LYNN, LAWRENCE A.

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

27 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2009
  • DocketNONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • DocketNONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • DocketNONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • DocketNONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • DocketNONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • DocketNONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2009
  • DocketNONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2009
  • DocketNONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2009
  • DocketNONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2009
  • DocketNONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2006
  • DocketANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BARRON, BARBARA JANE Person Filing - BALTIMORE ENNIS LAND COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2006
  • DocketANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RICHARDSON, H. TRACY III Person Filing - SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2006
  • DocketANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LOWERY, JAMES A. III Person Filing - CRANE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2006
  • DocketANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HENDRYX, MICHAEL Person Filing - CBS CORPORATION (DELAWARE CORPORATION) (F/K/A VIACOM INC SUCCESSOR BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • DocketANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD Person Filing - GUARDLINE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • DocketANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE Person Filing - CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2006
  • DocketANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COUGILL, THOMAS L. Person Filing - AJAX BOILER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLACK, LOU THOMPSON Person Filing - SCHUTZ, BETTY J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • DocketANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KOEPKE, JOHN A. Person Filing - PRATT & WHITNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLACK, LOU THOMPSON Person Filing - SCHUTZ, BENJAMIN HARRISON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BECHTEL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCE THERMAL HYDRONICS INC (FKA THE HYDROTHERM CORPORATION) is a litigant

Latest cases where AJAX BOILER INC. is a litigant