Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/08/2021 at 20:42:49 (UTC).

SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION vs. STRATEGY OPERATING LLC

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against STRATEGY OPERATING LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are LARRY WEIMAN and JERALYNN MANOR. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1786

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

LARRY WEIMAN

JERALYNN MANOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

Defendants

STRATEGY OPERATING LLC

ZONA ENERGY INC

Others

ZONA ENERGY INC (A DOMESTIC FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS

13455 Noel Road Suite 100

Dallas, TX 75240

STRATEGY OPERATING LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

210 N Main Street

Midland, TX 79701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DORE, BRENT ROBERT

1717 Park Row S

Houston, TX 77084

Defendant Attorney

SHIELDS, ROBERT BRIAN

16301 Quorum Dri

Addison, TX 75001

 

Court Documents

Defendant Strategy Operating LLCs Original Answer

11/09/2020: Defendant Strategy Operating LLCs Original Answer

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

12/10/2020: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Exhibit A-2

09/30/2020: Exhibit A-2

Exhibit A-1

09/30/2020: Exhibit A-1

Exhibit A

09/30/2020: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request Form

09/30/2020: Civil Process Request Form

Plaintiff's original petition

09/30/2020: Plaintiff's original petition

Citation

10/19/2020: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingCourt: 080; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 12/10/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SHIELDS, ROBERT BRIAN; Person Filing: STRATEGY OPERATING LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ZONA ENERGY INC (A DOMESTIC FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 10/1/2020; Tracking: 73795476; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: STRATEGY OPERATING LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 10/1/2020; Served: 10/13/2020; Tracking: 73795473; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DORE, BRENT ROBERT; Person Filing: SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Strategy Operating, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Schlumberger Technology Corporation is a litigant