Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/18/2020 at 07:58:55 (UTC).

SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION vs. PEARL OPCO MTN LLC

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PEARL OPCO MTN LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1224

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

Defendants

PEARL OPCO MTN LLC

PEARL MOUNTAIN EXPLORATION LLC

PEARL MOUNTAIN EXPLORATION INTERESTS LLC

QUILLEN ENERGY SERVICES LLC

PEARL O&G OPCO LLC

Others

PEARL MOUNTAIN EXPLORATION INTERESTS LLC I(A FOREIGN LIMITED

206 E 9Th Street Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

PEARL OPCO MTN LLC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE CITED

206 E 9Th Street Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

QUILLEN ENERGY SERVICES LLC A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

4127 Nw 122Nd Street Suite A Oklahoma

City, OK 73120

PEARL MOUNTAIN EXPLORATION LLC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

206 E 9Th Street Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

PEARL O&G OPCO LLC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE CITED

206 E 9Th Street Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DORE, BRENT ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Citation

09/01/2020: Citation

Citation

09/01/2020: Citation

Citation

09/01/2020: Citation

Citation

09/01/2020: Citation

Citation

09/11/2020: Citation

request for issuance of service

08/25/2020: request for issuance of service

exhibit a-2

08/25/2020: exhibit a-2

exhibit a-1

08/25/2020: exhibit a-1

exhibit a

08/25/2020: exhibit a

Plaintiffs Original Petition

08/25/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ASSIGNED TO CLERK/NOT ISSUED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PEARL MOUNTAIN EXPLORATION INTERESTS LLC I(A FOREIGN LIMITED; Tracking: 73780511; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ASSIGNED TO CLERK/NOT ISSUED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PEARL O&G OPCO LLC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE CITED; Tracking: 73780510; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: QUILLEN ENERGY SERVICES LLC A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 8/26/2020; Served: 9/8/2020; Tracking: 73780500; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ASSIGNED TO CLERK/NOT ISSUED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PEARL MOUNTAIN EXPLORATION INTERESTS LLC I(A FOREIGN LIMITED; Issued: 8/26/2020; Tracking: 73780496; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PEARL MOUNTAIN EXPLORATION LLC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 8/26/2020; Served: 9/1/2020; Tracking: 73780494; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PEARL O&G OPCO LLC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE CITED; Issued: 8/26/2020; Served: 9/1/2020; Tracking: 73780489; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PEARL OPCO MTN LLC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE CITED; Issued: 8/26/2020; Served: 9/1/2020; Tracking: 73780483; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DORE, BRENT ROBERT; Person Filing: SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pearl OPCO MTN, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Schlumberger Technology Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent R. Dore