Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/12/2015 at 23:01:32 (UTC).

SAWYER, WILLIE vs. A W CHESTERTON

Case Summary

On 05/31/2005 SAWYER, WILLIE filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******205I

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAWYER, WILLIE

Defendants

A W CHESTERTON

ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

ADVANCED THERMAL HYDRONICS INC (THE HYDROTHERM CORPORATION)

HYDROTHERM CORPORATION

AJAX BOILER & HEATER CO

AJAX BOILER INC

AK STEEL CORPORATION (FKA ARMCO INC)

ARMCO INC

ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA

ALCOA INC

ALLIED CHEMICAL CORPORATION

ALLIED SIGNAL

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

AMERICAN CYNAMID COMPANY

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AMETEK INC

AMOCO CHEMICAL COMPANY

AMOCO CORPORATION

265 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COON, BRENT WAYNE

Other Attorneys

ROBBINS, LAUREN MILLER

WARE, JAMES L.

HENRY, LESLIE M.

HOGAN, TIMOTHY J.

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

HORNE, NATHAN RAY

TIDWELL, JOHN L.

HUNTER, HAROLD HARVEY

HARTMAN, ANDREW STUART

SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS

BRADBERRY, DEBRA

RICE, B. STEVE

LEDYARD, DAVID W.

HAZEN, SCOTT PAUL

GIALLOURAKIS, NICHOLAS COSMOS

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

COLE, RYAN GRANT

ANDARSIO, PEDRO F

LEVINE, TORI SMITH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2014
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COLE, RYAN GRANT Person Filing - SUNOCO INC (R&M) IMPROPERLY NAMED AS SUN OIL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • SEVERANCE : Filing Attorney - COON, BRENT WAYNE Person Filing - SAWYER, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCE THERMAL HYDRONICS INC (FKA THE HYDROTHERM CORPORATION) is a litigant

Latest cases where ARMCO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIED CHEMICAL CORP is a litigant