This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:26:35 (UTC).

SANTOS, ARNULFO vs. TEXACO INC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 SANTOS, ARNULFO filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against TEXACO INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8693

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTOS, ARNULFO

Defendants

TEXACO INC

AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA CORP

ALLIEDSIGNAL INC

AMERICAN CYANAMID CO

AMERIPOL SYNPOL CORP

AMOCO OIL CO

AMOCOC OIL CO

ARCO CHEMICAL CO

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO

B A S F CORP

B F GOODRICH CORP

B P EXPLORATION & OIL INC

B P OIL CORP

BASIS PETROLEUM INC

BEAZER EAST INC

BEAZER MATERIALS & SERVICES INC

BIG THREE INDUSTRIES INC

CANADIANOXY OFFSHORE PRODUCTION CO

CHAMPION INTERNATIONAL CORP

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP

Defendant Attorney

KROGER, BILL

Other Attorneys

ELLISTON, GARY D.

JACKSON, JESSICA S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2007
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - MOBILE OIL REFINING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - SANTOS, ARNULFO

    Read MoreRead Less